Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Romedius Marie Leopold von Sarentheim

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

Titular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1730BornInnsbruck
23 Dec 175222.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
27 May 175322.8Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
31 Aug 176737.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
31 Aug 176737.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
11 Oct 176737.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
24 Mar 177443.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Romedius Marie Leopold von Sarentheim:
Bishop Romedius Marie Leopold von Sarentheim (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 20.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 107, and Page 451
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1773, Page 229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 11 Dec 2015