Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philipp Wirich Lorenz von Daun zu Sassenheim und Callenborn

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Tium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1720Born
31 May 174928.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Passau, Germany
10 Aug 175535.1Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
3 Jan 175736.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
3 Jan 175736.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tium
20 Feb 175736.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tium
20 Nov 176343.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Philipp Wirich Lorenz von Daun zu Sassenheim und Callenborn
Bishop Philipp Wirich Lorenz von Daun zu Sassenheim und Callenborn (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien

  • a priest for 8.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,757, Number 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 406, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast