Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kajetan Augustyn Warteresiewicz

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1755Born
29 Jun 177924.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
26 Jul 177924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
17 Nov 181964.7SelectedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
21 Feb 182065.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
16 Jul 182065.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
6 Feb 183175.9DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Kajetan Augustyn Warteresiewicz
Archbishop Kajetan Augustyn Warteresiewicz (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Armenian)

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 236
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 34
  • c1: CB, 20 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018