Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Jasiński

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1812BornDytiatyn k. Brzezan
3 May 183522.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Jan 183623.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 185947.0SelectedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
23 Mar 186047.2ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
23 Sep 186047.7Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
3 Mar 186249.2DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Adam Jasiński:
Bishop Adam Jasiński (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,954
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 469

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013