Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stepan Vaprovyč

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1899BornIvane-Puste
1926²26.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
Apr 1945³45.9Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
2 Mar 196464.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stepan Vaprovyč (VIAF: 100843786)
Bishop Stepan Vaprovyč (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów]

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 17
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,262
  • op: CB, 1 Mar 2015
  • c1: CB, 29 May 2015
  • bp: CB, 2 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Dec 2016