Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Grygory Balahurak, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1909Born
1 May 192717.8ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
16 Dec 193425.4Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
21 May 193626.8Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
Apr 1945³35.7Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
2 Oct 196556.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Grygory Balahurak
Bishop Grygory Balahurak O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStanislaviv
Death PlacePrison

  • a priest for 29.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,265
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1945, Number 18
  • bp/prof/op/c1: CB, 25 Feb 2015
  • sole: CB, 1 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast