Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konstantyn Chekhovych (Czechowicz)

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1847Born
5 Jan 187325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
17 Nov 189649.0AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
21 Feb 189749.3Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
28 Apr 191567.5DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland

MicroData Summary for Konstantyn Chekhovych (Czechowicz) (VIAF: 72277152)
Bishop Konstantyn Chekhovych (Czechowicz) (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDevyatyr
Ordained BishopPrzemyśl, Diocese of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian)

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,641
  • bp/op/c1/d: CB, 5 Mar 2015
  • c2+: CB, 9 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,537
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Sep 2017