Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karol Józef Fischer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Titular Bishop of Mallus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1847Born
18 Jul 186922.3Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
15 Apr 190154.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
15 Apr 190154.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Mallus
19 May 190154.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mallus
21 Sep 193184.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Karol Józef Fischer
Bishop Karol Józef Fischer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJasło
Ordained BishopPrzemyśl, Diocese of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 362
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,901, Number 17
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast