Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Ivan Sleziuk

Deceased

Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1896BornZhyvachiv
1923²26.9Ordained PriestPriest
Apr 1945³49.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
17 Jan 194751.0SucceededBishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
2 Dec 197377.8DiedBishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
27 Jun 2001Beatified

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Ivan Sleziuk:
Bishop Bl. Ivan Sleziuk (born , died ) Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów]

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 15
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,958

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015