Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julian Voronovsky, M.S.U. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sambir-Drohobych (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1936BornHumnynska
26 Oct 196832.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
27 Oct 196832.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
30 Sep 198650.4Ordained BishopBishop
16 Jan 199154.7ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
16 Jan 199154.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Deultum
30 Mar 199457.9AppointedBishop of Sambir-Drohobych (Ukrainian), Ukraine
27 Oct 201175.5RetiredBishop of Sambir-Drohobych (Ukrainian), Ukraine
28 Feb 201376.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Sambir-Drohobych (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Julian Voronovsky:
Bishop Julian Voronovsky M.S.U. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sambir-Drohobych

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,053
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,266
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2011
  • d: CB, 28 Feb 2013
  • od/c0: CB, 4 Mar 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Apr 2014