Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodor (Taras) Martynyuk, M.S.U.

Auxiliary Bishop of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Mopta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1974 BornYaremche
8 Jan 199520.9ProfessedMember of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
28 Aug 199723.5Solemn ProfessedMember of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
28 Jul 199925.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
20 Jan 200025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
12 Mar 201541.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
12 Mar 201541.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mopta
22 May 201541.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mopta

MicroData Summary for Teodor (Taras) Martynyuk:
Bishop Teodor (Taras) Martynyuk M.S.U. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ternopil-Zboriv

Please contact the Bishop through the Archeparchy of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2015
  • prof/od/c01: CB, 12 Mar 2015
  • c1: CB, 17 Mar 2015
  • c2+: CB, 24 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,494

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 11 Dec 2015