Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julian Gbur, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Stryj (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1942BornBrzezawa, Poland
21 Jun 197027.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
21 Feb 199451.3SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
30 Mar 199451.4ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
30 Mar 199451.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bareta
7 Jul 199451.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bareta
21 Jul 200057.7AppointedBishop of Stryj (Ukrainian), Ukraine
24 Mar 201168.4DiedBishop of Stryj (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Julian Gbur:
Bishop Julian Gbur S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Stryj

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,350
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Apr 2014