Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodor Majkowicz

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław-Gdańsk (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1932Born
24 Jun 195624.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 199159.0IncardinatedPriest of Przemyśl (Ruthenian), Poland
24 May 199664.3AppointedBishop of Wrocław-Gdańsk (Ukrainian), Poland
12 Jul 199664.5Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław-Gdańsk (Ukrainian), Poland
3 Aug 199664.5InstalledBishop of Wrocław-Gdańsk (Ukrainian), Poland
9 May 199866.3DiedBishop of Wrocław-Gdańsk (Ukrainian), Poland

MicroData Summary for Teodor Majkowicz:
Bishop Teodor Majkowicz (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław-Gdańsk

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,760
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • inca: CB, 23 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015