Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vasyl Hovera

Apostolic Administrator of Kazakhstan and Central Asia, Faithful of Byzantine Rite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1972 Born
28 Jul 199623.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
2 Mar 199724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1 Jun 201946.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kazakhstan and Central Asia, Faithful of Byzantine Rite
15 Dec 201947.0InstalledApostolic Administrator of Kazakhstan and Central Asia, Faithful of Byzantine Rite

MicroData Summary for Vasyl Hovera
Father Vasyl Hovera (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Kazakhstan and Central Asia, Faithful of Byzantine Rite

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIvano-Frankivsk
Ordained PriestSt. George, Cathedral, Lviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Please contact the Father through the Apostolic Administration of Kazakhstan and Central Asia, Faithful of Byzantine Rite.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2019
  • opd/c1: CB, 8 Jun 2019
  • od/c0/i: CB, 19 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 19 Nov 2019

Quantcast