Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wasyl Ihor Medwit, O.S.B.M.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Donets’k-Kharkiv (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Hadriane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1949 BornPrzemysl, Poland
2 Feb 198030.5ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1 Jan 198434.4Solemn ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
31 May 198434.9Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
30 Mar 199444.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
30 Mar 199444.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadriane
12 Jul 199445.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadriane
30 Sep 199647.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
20 Sep 199748.2AppointedArchiepiscopal Exarch of Kyiv-Vyshhorod (Ukrainian), Ukraine
6 Dec 200455.4AppointedCurial Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
17 Mar 200959.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Donets’k-Kharkiv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
25 Oct 201364.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Donets’k-Kharkiv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Wasyl Ihor Medwit:
Bishop Wasyl Ihor Medwit O.S.B.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Donets’k-Kharkiv

Please contact the Bishop through the Archiepiscopal Exarchate of Donets’k-Kharkiv (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,353
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2013
  • prof/sole: CB, 6 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 7 Apr 2014