Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vasyl Volodymyr Tuchapets, O.S.B.M.

Archiepiscopal Exarch of Kharkiv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Centuriones


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1967 Born
6 Oct 199124.0ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
29 Dec 199629.2Perpetual VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
5 Jan 199729.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
12 Jul 199729.7Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
2 Apr 201446.5ConfirmedArchiepiscopal Exarch of Kharkiv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
2 Apr 201446.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Centuriones
21 May 201446.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centuriones
1 Jun 201446.6InstalledArchiepiscopal Exarch of Kharkiv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Vasyl Volodymyr Tuchapets
Bishop Vasyl Volodymyr Tuchapets O.S.B.M. (born ) Archiepiscopal Exarch of Kharkiv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYavoriv

Please contact the Bishop through the Archiepiscopal Exarchate of Kharkiv (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2014
  • perp/c1: CB, 2 Apr 2014
  • prof: CB, 6 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 25 Apr 2014
  • c34: CB, 28 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,165
  • od/c0: CB, 1 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Aug 2017