Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archeparchy of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian)

Ternopoliensis-Zborovensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vasyl Semeniuk, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Eparchy of Ternopil (Ukrainian)
20 April 1993ErectedArcheparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian) Eparchy of Ternopil (Ukrainian) (erected)
21 July 2000Territory LostEparchy of Ternopil (Ukrainian) Eparchy of Buchach {Bučač} (Ukrainian) (erected)
21 July 2000Territory LostArcheparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian)
Eparchy of Ternopil (Ukrainian)
Eparchy of Sokal (Ukrainian) (erected)
Eparchy of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian)
21 July 2000UnitedEparchy of Ternopil (Ukrainian)
Eparchy of Zboriv (Ukrainian)
Eparchy of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian)
Archeparchy of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian)
21 November 2011ElevatedEparchy of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian) Archeparchy of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Eparchy of Ternopil (Ukrainian)
1999598,100995,00060.1%199262252,6584258530ap2000
Eparchy of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian)
2000523,400824,10063.5%237122492,10213264377ap2001
2001277,830396,90070.0%185162011,38213457362ap2002
2002479,052760,40063.0%202212232,14843341353ap2003
2003455,613759,35560.0%210222321,96333341357ap2004
2004465,610760,24561.2%211242351,98133448347ap2005
2009447,350740,63060.4%269302991,49616465417ap2010
2010445,000737,00060.4%277303071,44916465417ap2011
Archeparchy of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian)

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 15 Feb 2014