Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ivan Kulyk

Bishop-Elect of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1979 Born
8 May 200526.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
10 Sep 201940.4ConfirmedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1 Dec 201940.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Ivan Kulyk
Father Ivan Kulyk (born ) Bishop-Elect of Kamyanets-Podilskyi

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerevoloka, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian)
Ordained BishopNativity of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral, Khmelnytskyi

Please contact the Father through the Eparchy of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Sep 2019
  • bp/opd: CB, 10 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 10 Oct 2019

Quantcast