Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hryhoriy Komar

Auxiliary Bishop of Sambir-Drohobych (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Acci


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1976 Born
12 Feb 200124.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sambir-Drohobych (Ukrainian), Ukraine
22 Apr 200124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Sambir-Drohobych (Ukrainian), Ukraine
25 Jun 201438.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sambir-Drohobych (Ukrainian), Ukraine
25 Jun 201438.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Acci
22 Aug 201438.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acci

MicroData Summary for Hryhoriy Komar
Bishop Hryhoriy Komar (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sambir-Drohobych

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLetnya

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Sambir-Drohobych (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2014
  • od/c01: CB, 25 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 3 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017