Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stepan Sus

Curial Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Zygris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1981 Born
2005²23.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
30 Jun 200624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
15 Nov 201938.1ConfirmedCurial Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
15 Nov 201938.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Zygris
12 Jan 202038.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zygris

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stepan Sus
Bishop Stepan Sus (born ) Curial Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian)
Ordained BishopResurrection, Cathedral, Kyiv, Archeparchy of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Please contact the Bishop through the Archeparchy of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2019
  • c1: CB, 15 Nov 2019
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 13 Jan 2020

Quantcast