Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lev Šeptycki (Czeptytski)

Deceased

Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1717BornSeptyci
7 Nov 174225.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 174830.5SelectedBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1749²31.3ConfirmedBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
14 May 174931.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
9 Jul 176244.8SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
20 Dec 176245.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1 Feb 177860.4SucceededArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
13 May 177961.7DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lev Šeptycki (Czeptytski):
Archbishop Lev Šeptycki (Czeptytski) (born , died ) Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 249
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 14,760
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 16 Feb 2015