Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josyf Botsian (Bocian)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian)

Titular See: Lutsk/Ruthenian


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1879BornBusko
21 Aug 190425.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 191435.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop
24 Feb 192142.0ConfirmedTitular Bishop
20 Sep 192445.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
21 Nov 192647.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Josyf Botsian (Bocian):
Bishop Josyf Botsian (Bocian) (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 22.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,259
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 48
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 231

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013