Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerzy Pawłowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten

Titular Bishop of Alalis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1732³BornLithuania
15 Mar 175522.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 May 175523.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 178048.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
19 Jun 178048.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Alalis
26 Mar 178148.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alalis

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerzy Pawłowski:
Bishop Jerzy Pawłowski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 71, and Page 454

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 23 Sep 2013