Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Franciszek Kurdwanowski, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Titular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1645³Born
166115.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
22 May 171367.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
22 May 171367.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
17 Dec 171368.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
5 Jan 173084.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Franciszek Kurdwanowski
Bishop Jan Franciszek Kurdwanowski S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZawichost

  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 257
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1713, Number 25
  • c34: CB, 29 Jul 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,523

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018