Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Pignatelli, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1659³Born
1675²15.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
22 Mar 168122.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of Clerics Regular
13 Mar 168324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
23 Sep 171556.5AppointedBishop of Potenza, Italy
6 Oct 171556.5Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza, Italy
14 Jan 172262.8AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
21 Mar 173071.0DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Pignatelli
Bishop Carlo Pignatelli C.R. (born Mar 1659, died ) Bishop of Gaeta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1724
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 135, and Page 323
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast