Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Benedetto Caietano Giuseppe Cardinal Odescalchi-Erba

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1679BornComo
11 Oct 171132.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Oct 171132.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 171132.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
20 Dec 1711³32.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
25 Jan 171232.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
5 Oct 171233.2AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
30 Jan 171333.5Elevated to Cardinal
1 Apr 171535.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
29 Jan 172545.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
6 Dec 173657.3ResignedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
13 Dec 174061.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Caietano Giuseppe Odescalchi-Erba:
Benedetto Caietano Giuseppe Cardinal Odescalchi-Erba (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 29.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
  • a cardinal for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Jan 1713
  • b: CB, 10 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,580

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Mar 2014