Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerolamo Francesco Malpasciuto

Deceased

Bishop of Vercelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1656BornMontibili
27 May 167923.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 172771.1SelectedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
30 Jul 172771.2ConfirmedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
16 Nov 172771.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vercelli, Italy
9 Aug 172872.2DiedBishop of Vercelli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Francesco Malpasciuto:
Bishop Gerolamo Francesco Malpasciuto (born , died ) Bishop of Vercelli

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 411
  • ob/c2+: AT, 28 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 28 May 2015