Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Maria Litta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cremona

Titular Archbishop of Naupactus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1671BornMediolanen
22 Sep 171443.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 171847.0AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
23 Jan 171847.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cremona, Italy
12 Sep 174978.6ResignedBishop of Cremona, Italy
22 Sep 174978.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
4 Mar 175483.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Maria Litta:
Archbishop Alessandro Maria Litta (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cremona

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 176
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 28 May 2015