Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mattia Joccia

Deceased

Bishop of Venafro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1669Born
20 Sep 169223.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Sep 169223.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 171849.2AppointedBishop of Venafro, Italy
15 May 171849.2Ordained BishopBishop of Venafro, Italy
19 Jan 173363.9DiedBishop of Venafro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mattia Joccia
Bishop Mattia Joccia (born , died ) Bishop of Venafro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapua

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 407
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018