Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Crisostomo Calvi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Montefeltro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1681BornVenice
5 Oct 170422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
11 May 171836.5AppointedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
15 May 171836.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
7 Sep 172947.8AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
26 Apr 174765.4DiedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Crisostomo Calvi:
Bishop Giovanni Crisostomo Calvi O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Montefeltro

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 154, and Page 200
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015