Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Louis de Cahorne de La Palun

Deceased

Bishop of Vaison


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1670BornCarpentras
6 Mar 169424.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 172454.9AppointedBishop of Vaison, France
1 Jan 172555.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vaison, France
24 Jan 174878.0DiedBishop of Vaison, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Louis de Cahorne de La Palun:
Bishop Joseph-Louis de Cahorne de La Palun (born , died ) Bishop of Vaison

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013