Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccolò Maria Lomellini, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Faenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1689BornGenova
170616.1ProfessedMember of Clerks Regular of Somasca
21 Dec 171526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
7 Feb 172939.2AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
13 Mar 172939.3Ordained BishopBishop of Faenza, Italy
30 Oct 174252.9DiedBishop of Faenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Maria Lomellini:
Bishop Niccolò Maria Lomellini C.R.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Faenza

  • a priest for 26.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1737
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 199
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013