Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottavio Ringhieri

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1680Born
22 Dec 170323.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 173656.2AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
29 Apr 173656.3Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
8 Jan 175575.0DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Ringhieri
Bishop Ottavio Ringhieri (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 102
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1736, Number 16
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Number 3,223

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 14 Jun 2020

Quantcast