Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Ghislieri

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Azotus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1684BornBologna
25 Mar 172540.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 172944.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
4 Sep 172945.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
16 May 173449.7DiedTitular Bishop of Azotus

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Ghislieri:
Bishop Antonio Maria Ghislieri (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Azotus

  • a priest for 9.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 110
  • ob/c2: CB, 2 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,036

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015