Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincent Antoine Alamanni Nasi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Spain

Titular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1679BornFirenze, Italy
2 Nov 171031.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Nov 171031.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 172344.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
30 Nov 172344.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
21 Dec 172344.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
Nov 1730³51.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
23 Dec 173051.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
26 Mar 173555.9DiedApostolic Nuncio to Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincent Antoine Alamanni Nasi
Archbishop Vincent Antoine Alamanni Nasi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Spain

  • a priest for 24.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 352
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 21
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Oct 2016