Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Maria Nappi, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1657BornNapoli
21 Sep 168023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
25 Jun 172769.8AppointedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
2 Jul 172769.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
29 Jan 173577.4DiedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria Nappi:
Bishop Angelo Maria Nappi O.S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 86
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 7 Oct 2013