Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Attaffi

Deceased

Bishop of Squillace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1656³BornStignano
16 Mar 168024.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 170650.8AppointedBishop of Sarno, Italy
12 Dec 170650.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sarno, Italy
11 Feb 171862.0AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
17 Aug 173377.5DiedBishop of Squillace, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Attaffi:
Bishop Marco Antonio Attaffi (born , died ) Bishop of Squillace

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 345, and Page 363
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015