Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ettore Quarti (del Quarto)

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1682³BornLaurenzana
14 May 171936.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 May 171936.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 172139.1AppointedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
14 Dec 172139.1Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
17 Nov 173452.0AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
10 May 174764.5DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ettore Quarti (del Quarto):
Bishop Ettore Quarti (del Quarto) (born , died ) Bishop of Caserta

  • a priest for 27.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 86
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 46
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 152

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015