Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Grisconi, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vieste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1659³BornRavello
12 Jun 168324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
24 Jan 171858.7AppointedBishop of Vieste, Italy
30 Jan 171858.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vieste, Italy
16 Sep 171960.3DiedBishop of Vieste, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Grisconi:
Bishop Giuseppe Grisconi Sch. P. (born , died ) Bishop of Vieste

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 412
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015