Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Imperialis Pedicini

Deceased

Bishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1675BornVitulano
14 Mar 169924.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 171843.1AppointedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
19 Mar 171843.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
May 172449.2DiedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Imperialis Pedicini:
Bishop Imperialis Pedicini (born ) Bishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino

  • a priest for 25.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 419

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013