Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Votta

Deceased

Bishop of Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1654BornCusentin
26 Mar 167824.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 171763.9AppointedBishop of Isola, Italy
2 Jan 171864.0Ordained BishopBishop of Isola, Italy
Jun 172268.4DiedBishop of Isola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Votta:
Bishop Domenico Votta (born ) Bishop of Isola

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013