Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernardo Maria Cardinal Conti, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1664Born
21 Dec 168925.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Dec 171046.7AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
4 Jan 171146.8Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
3 Jun 172056.2ResignedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
16 Jun 172157.2Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jul 172157.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
3 Aug 172157.4AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
23 Apr 173066.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

MicroData Summary
Bernardo Maria Conti
Bernardo Maria Cardinal Conti O.S.B.
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Madonna della Mentorella, Church, Tivoli, Diocese of Tivoli

Relatives
  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
  • a cardinal for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jun 1721
  • ob/c2: CB, 9 Jul 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 1
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025