Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giannicolò Cardinal Conti

Deceased

Bishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617²Born
14 Jan 166447.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
15 Feb 166649.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 Mar 166649.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
29 Mar 166649.2AppointedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
2 May 166649.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
8 Aug 169174.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
20 Jan 169881.0DiedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Giannicolò Conti
Giannicolò Cardinal Conti
(born 1617, died )
Bishop of Ancona e Numana

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoli

Relatives
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
  • a cardinal for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Jan 1664
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 82
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Aug 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025