Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Lanfranconi, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Terni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1596Born
3 Aug 166771.5AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
21 Aug 166771.5Ordained BishopBishop of Terni, Italy
6 Mar 167478.1DiedBishop of Terni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Lanfranconi
Bishop Pietro Lanfranconi O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Terni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAncona

  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 228
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 210
  • bd/c34: CB, 17 Jul 2014
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1667, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018