Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Cosentino

Deceased

Bishop of Anglona-Tursi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹BornAieta
24 Apr 166129.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Oct 166735.7AppointedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
9 Oct 166735.7Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
12 Apr 170270.2DiedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matteo Cosentino:
Bishop Matteo Cosentino (died ) Bishop of Anglona-Tursi

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 86
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 84
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015