Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Carrara

Deceased

Bishop of Fondi (Fundi)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1670³BornSora
1705¹34.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 172150.1AppointedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
26 Jan 172150.1Ordained BishopBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
21 Mar 175786.3DiedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Carrara:
Bishop Antonio Carrara (born , died ) Bishop of Fondi (Fundi)

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 207
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015