Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Stabile, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1661³BornCastrovillari
21 Apr 168524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
8 Jun 171857.1AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
12 Jun 171857.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
19 Nov 172968.5DiedBishop of Bova, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Stabile:
Bishop Paolo Stabile O.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Bova

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1722
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 125
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015