Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adriano Sermattei

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1680BornAssisi
4 Sep 170727.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 171332.5AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
19 Feb 171332.6Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
15 Mar 171938.7AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
9 Apr 173150.7DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Adriano Sermattei:
Bishop Adriano Sermattei (born , died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

  • a priest for 23.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 131, and Page 417
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015