Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio PaternÚ

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1652BornNapoli
4 Jun 167826.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Feb 171966.9AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
12 Feb 171967.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
1730¹77.8DiedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio PaternÚ:
Archbishop Antonio PaternÚ (born , died 1730) Archbishop of Lanciano

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1719, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015