Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Zanobetti, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1679Born
24 Sep 170122.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
27 Aug 170223.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
27 Jun 171839.0AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
10 Jul 171839.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
10 Aug 174263.1DiedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Zanobetti
Bishop Giacinto Zanobetti O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZara

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 151
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018